Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Yolanda Sanchez-Rodriguez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Denise Larman, Anthony Larman, represented by Kenneth L. Dziesinski, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time566 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2011 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 8 |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Complaint & Cross-Complaint (Atty David Pirrone & Kenneth Dziesinski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 06/09/2011 |
|
May 19, 2011 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = re (Atty D. Pirrone) Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2011 |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = re (Atty K. Dziesinski) Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 05/04/2011 |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee Text = re: Atty K. Dziesinski 6/9/11 - 6/28/11 (Atty K. Dziesinski) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Unavailability of Counsel/no fee Decision = M Closed = 04/06/2011 |
|
January 20, 2011 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: Bankruptcy/Stay Text = atty Dziesinski Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Bankruptcy Decision = M Closed = 12/08/2010 |
|
November 30, 2010 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 22 |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = re (Atty D. Pirrone) Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 11/15/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.