Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Luz C. De La Pena, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Aztec Foreclosure Corporation, Priority Mortgage, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions194 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time194 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Text = order of dismissal by court for non appearance at 7/8/10 hearing Judge Kleinberg Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 07/12/2010 |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: Dismissal of Action Legacy Name = CV-Ntc:Dismissal of Action Decision = M Closed = 07/12/2010 |
|
July 08, 2010 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 1 |
|
May 25, 2010 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 1 |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2009 |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = Richard Taguinod Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2009 |
|
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.