Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Russell Jones, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Mark L. Wainwright, Ohlone I, Llc, represented by David Kraft, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Beth A. R. McGowen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeth A. R. McGowen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time2480 days |
Minute Order
Date: May 03, 2016Minute Order
Date: December 16, 2015Minute Order
Date: June 30, 2016Minute Order
Date: October 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 22 |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Appl on Stip/Order to Continuance of Trial Date (Joseph McCarthy) |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte for Continuance of Trial Date (Joseph McCarthy) *Pending* |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support of Joseph McCarthy in Support of Ex Parte Appl on Stip/Order to Continuance of Trial Date (Joseph McCarthy) |
|
June 30, 2016 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 7 |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes Non-Criminal |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Exparte stip & order to continue trial, by atty McCarthy. |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application and Order: Continue Exparte stip & order to continue trial (atty McCarthy); Order is GRANTED and the trial shall now be heard on 7/18/16, signed Judge McGowen. |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes Non-Criminal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.