Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Trend Micro Incorporated, A California Corporation, Trend Micro Incorporated, A Japanese Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Fortinet, Inc., represented by Marc Nathan Bernstein, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with James P. Kleinberg presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2001 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions270 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2012 | Hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Department 8 |
|
January 11, 2012 | Hearing |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: Department 1 |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Text = #G-38386 Stip & Order of Dismissal (in its entirety with prejudice) - signed by Judge James P. Kleinberg Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2012 |
|
December 21, 2011 | Hearing |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Department 1 |
|
December 16, 2011 | Hearing | Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication | |
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Lodged Under Seal Text = reply in support of its mtn that as a matter of law, the parties agreement preserves Fortinet's right to challenge patent validity. 12-16-11 9am dept.1 Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal Decision = M Closed = 12/09/2011 Judge: James P. Kleinberg |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF FORTINET INC.?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION THAT AS A MATTER OF LAW, THE PARTIES? AGREEMENT PRESERVES FORTINET?S RIGHT TO CHALLENGE PATENT VALIDITY #G-37655 Legacy Name = CV Ntc of... Decision = M Closed = 12/09/2011 |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Appendix Text = #G-37655 APPENDIX OF SELECTED NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF FORTINET, INC.?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION THAT AS A MATTER OF LAW, THE PARTIES? AGREEMENT PRESERVES FORTINET?S RIGHT TO CHALLENGE PATENT VALIDITY Legacy Name = CV Appendix Decision = M Closed = 12/09/2011 |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Lodged Under Seal Text = Will B. Fitton declaration in support of Fortinet, Inc.'s reply in support of its mtn that as a matter of law, the parties' agreement preserves Fortinets' right to challenge patent validity Legacy Name = CV Lodged under Seal Decision = M Closed = 12/09/2011 |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 12/09/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.