Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Humberto Rodriguez, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marc G. Hynes, against Alma Aguilar, Liberato Aguilar, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions94 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time3903 days |
Memorandum of Costs
Date: February 11, 2020Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued
Date: February 18, 2020Application: Renewal Judgment
Date: February 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Application: Renewal Judgment Application for Renewal of Judgment |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request: Action Text = Minute Order on 4-04-13 Re: Setting OSC FTA Hearing on 6-06-13 to be Set Aside (Signed by Judge Kirwan) Legacy Name = CV Request for Action/Ord Decision = G Closed = 05/08/2013 |
|
April 04, 2013 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
July 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Bankruptcy/Stay Text = and stay of proceedings as to all parties. (Thomas O. Gillis) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Bankruptcy Decision = M Closed = 07/05/2012 |
|
June 26, 2012 | Hearing | Hearing: Order of Examination | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 06/13/2012 |
|
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Application: Order of Examination Text = against Def Liberta Aguillar (Marc G. Hynes 6-26-12 @9am in D-8 Legacy Name = CV Appl/Ord:Appear/Exam of Debtor Decision = M Closed = 05/02/2012 Judge: Peter H. Kirwan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.