Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Amy Gugliardo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Neal A. Cabrinha presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 16, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions129 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time211 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2009 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 22 |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = In favor of plt. and agst. def. for damages: $32,845.48, Interest: $1,034.85, Atty's Fees: $2,085.00, Costs: $482.00, Total: $36,447.33. Signed by Hon. Neal A. Cabrinha Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 08/20/2009 |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Text = Order permitting the use of copies in lieu of originals is granted. Signed by Hon. Neal A. Cabrinha Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 08/20/2009 |
|
August 11, 2009 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 19 |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = atty raymond lee Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 07/24/2009 |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Text = As to Does 1 to 10 Only (Atty Lee). Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2009 |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2009 |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = For an Order Permitting the use of copies in lieu of origs. Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2009 |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Text = Of Calculation of Accrued interest. Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2009 |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration: CCP 585 Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.