Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jose Luis Guerrero, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Maria Guerrero, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Joshua Weinstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoshua Weinstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned/Undeliverable Mail | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for default filed | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review 11-14-2018. Granted. Sent to the Clerk's Office |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event | FC 2336 Packet Received for Review | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail amended petition |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Request: Enter Default | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | FC 2336 Packet Received for Review | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Request: Enter Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.