Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lawrence M Brenner, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Legacy Name = PR Ord:Appt Successor Trustee Decision = G Closed = 03/03/2009 |
|
February 23, 2009 | Hearing | Hearing: Petition | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2009 |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Petition: Probate Other (First) Text = petn for order confirming successor trustee & trust assets points & autho in support....$320 pd Legacy Name = PR Petn:Initiating Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2008 |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Points & autho in support of petn for order confirming successor trustee & trust assets. Legacy Name = PR Other Decision = M Closed = 12/31/2008 |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Text = 02/23/09-- Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 12/31/2008 |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.