Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jacqueline Werbelow, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order: Final Discharge Text = Jacqueline Werbelow Legacy Name = PR Decl/Ord:Final Discharge Decision = G Closed = 12/10/2009 |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = By Jacqueline Werbelow. Legacy Name = PR Receipt of Distributee Decision = M Closed = 08/10/2009 |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = By Pamela Cadotte. Legacy Name = PR Receipt of Distributee Decision = M Closed = 08/10/2009 |
|
July 13, 2009 | Hearing | Hearing: Final Distribution | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Final Distribution Legacy Name = PR Jgmt on Final Distrib Decision = G Closed = 07/13/2009 |
|
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = PR Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2009 |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Waiver Text = Accounting by Pamela Cadotte. Legacy Name = PR Waiver of.... Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2009 |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Text = 07-13-09 Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2009 |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = Petn for fnl distr. without rendering acct. and for allowance of statutory Atty's Fees. Paid $350.00 Legacy Name = PR Petn:Final Distribution Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2009 |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Waiver Text = Accounting by Jacqueline Werbelow. Legacy Name = PR Waiver of.... Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.