Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Federated Financial Corporation Of America, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Andrew Thomas Lamore, against Peggy Tsai, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryOther Collections Limited (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = Santa Clara / issued: 8-19-10 / deficit: $31,366.48 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 09/14/2012 |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = santa clara, issued 9/9/09 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 04/25/2012 Judge: Mark H. Pierce |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Issued) Text = $26425.36 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 08/19/2010 |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = Interest - $2406.01 07/29/10 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 08/19/2010 |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm Decision = M Closed = 05/12/2010 |
|
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Issued) Text = $24,019.35 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 09/09/2009 |
|
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default Text = $23,994.35 total, signed Judge Herlihy. Legacy Name = CV Default Jgmt Decision = G Closed = 07/28/2009 |
|
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2009 |
|
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration: CCP 1033 Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP1033 Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2009 |
|
July 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration: CCP 585 Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.