Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Sharon Favinger, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions139 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time268 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2009 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 22 |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 08/05/2009 |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = JUDGMENT FOR PLTF AND AGAINST DEFT SHARON FAVINGER FOR A TOTAL AMT OF $23,528.20 Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 08/05/2009 |
|
July 30, 2009 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 19 |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = for an order premitting the use of copies Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2009 |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Interest Legacy Name = CV Decl:Interest Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2009 |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = summary of the case Legacy Name = CV Other |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2009 |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration: CCP 585 Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2009 |
|
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Text = as to does 1-10 only Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.