Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hallie N. Zimmerman, against Niklaus Kish, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time185 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = by atty Jerome Yalon Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2009 |
|
June 25, 2009 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 1 |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Text = dism w/out prej by court Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail Decision = M Closed = 06/29/2009 |
|
May 26, 2009 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 1 |
|
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = atty lourdes slinsky Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 05/19/2009 |
|
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 05/19/2009 |
|
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Non-Service Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 03/26/2009 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2008 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.