Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sheila Robinson, Stephen Robinson, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Cal-Western Reconveyance Coporation, Eddie Cameron, Emc Mortgage Corporation, Lasalle Bank National Association, represented by S. Christopher Yoo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Theodore C. Zayner presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 02, 2008 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions391 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time3151 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application for Refund Filing party cancelled their copy job order. Please refund the charge amount of $986.00 on 5-11-16 for case number 1-08-cv-124255. The confirmation number is 00952G. |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Remittitur Text = # H040815. Respondent to recover costs. The appeal is dismissed. Legacy Name = CV Remittitur Decision = M Closed = 02/06/2015 |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Designation Text = 8.124 Legacy Name = CV Designation of Transcript on Appeal Decision = M Closed = 03/25/2014 |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice: Appeal (Unlimited) Text = pro pers Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appeal/Unltd Decision = M Closed = 03/17/2014 |
|
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Text = Motion to vacate judgment dated 6/2/11 is DENIED; Motion to vacate judgment dated 9/23/11 is DENIED, signed Judge Stoelker. Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = D Closed = 03/06/2014 Judge: Carrie A. Zepeda |
|
March 04, 2014 | Hearing | Motion: Vacate | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Text = to defende counsels opposition to plaintiffs motion to vacate the void judgment entered on 6/2/11 Legacy Name = CV Reply Decision = M Closed = 02/24/2014 |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Text = to defense counsels opposition to plaintiffs motion to cacate the void judgment entered on 9/23/14 Legacy Name = CV Reply Decision = M Closed = 02/24/2014 |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Text = opposition to plaintiffs motion to vacate the void judgment entered on 6/2/11 and motion to vacate the void judgment entered on 9/23/11, declaration of Lashon Harris in support thereof Legacy Name = CV Opposition Decision = M Closed = 02/19/2014 |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion: Vacate Text = the void Judgment entered 9/23/11 pro per 3/4/14, 9am, D2 Legacy Name = CV Mtn to Vacate Judge: Mary E. Arand |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.