Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ray'S & Herbs Used Cars, Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Petra Wright, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Helen E. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen E. Williams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Notice: Renewal of Judgment
Date: October 17, 2017Proof of Service: Mail
Date: October 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Renewal of Judgment | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail on Renewal of Judgment |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Costs $ 315.00, Credit $ 0.00, Interest $ 3048.10 DOM: 12/21/16 |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Application: Renewal Judgment | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = costs $ 250.00, credit $ 0.00, interest $ 2168.92 DOM: 1/22/14 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Assignment Text = assignee: Judgment and Debt Recovery Services Legacy Name = SC Assignment of Judgment |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = Santa Clara; Deficit: $1,780.00; issued 10/30/07 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Partially Satis Judge: Kenneth Paul Barnum |
|
January 14, 2008 | Hearing | Hearing: Claim of Exemption | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = service by mail of notice of hearing & notice of opposition on Claim of Exemption to Petra Wright Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc |
|
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice: Hearing on Claim of Exemption Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Hrg:Claim of Exemption |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.