Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hansen Medical, Inc. filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Joseph Huber presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 10, 2000 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions90 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time669 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Remittitur Text = REMITTITUR ISSUED 05-25-10. The appeal filed on 07-31-08 is dismissed with each party to bear its own costs. Legacy Name = CV Remittitur Decision = M Closed = 05/26/2010 |
|
February 05, 2010 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Text = EF #G-20040 Stip & Order of Dismissal (with prejudice), signed by Judge Joseph H. Huber. Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2010 |
|
December 04, 2009 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = EF #G-19303 CMC reset from 12/4/09 to 2/5/10, by the Court. Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC Decision = M Closed = 12/03/2009 |
|
September 25, 2009 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = EF #G-18254 CMC reset from 9/25/09 to 12/4/09, by the Court. Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC Decision = M Closed = 09/23/2009 |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice Text = EF #G-16955 Further CMC set for 9/25/09, 10am, D8c. Legacy Name = CV Clerk's Notice Decision = M Closed = 07/21/2009 |
|
July 20, 2009 | Hearing | Motion: New Trial | |
July 20, 2009 | Hearing | Hearing: Motion hearings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.