Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil - Limited case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
The motion of plaintiffs, Mike Magers, Man Ko, Chun Ko, Lola Walmer and Donna Gonsalves (collectively the "Magers") for an order of new trial pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure sections 657-662, and ...
Judge: Laurie M. Earl |
|
April 22, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
The motion of Plaintiffs and Cross-Defendants Mike Magers, Man Ko, Chun Ko, Lola Walmer and Donna Gonsalves (collectively the "Magers") for an award of attorney's fees pursuant to Code of Civil Proced...
Judge: Laurie M. Earl |
|
March 14, 2013 | Tentative Ruling |
The motion of Defendants and Cross-Complainants Barry Pavan, Patsy Pavan, Frank Pavan and Mary Louise Pavan ("Pavans") to tax costs, in whole or part, of Plaintiffs Mike Magers, Pat Cochran, Man Ko, a...
Judge: Laurie M. Earl |
|
November 13, 2012 | Tentative Ruling |
MAGERS, et al. v. PAVAN, and related cross-actions. Case No. 34-2007-00881239 (Consolidated with 07AM04185) This is a consolidated action relating to a real property dispute involving several parcels ...
Judge: Laurie M. Earl |
|
September 29, 2010 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendant/cross-complainant Frank Pavan's motion for a trial preference pursuant to CCP 36(a) is DENIED for the reasons set forth below. Defendant Pavan seeks trial preference in this litigation invol...
Judge: Steve White |
|
March 30, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
Hearing Date: 04/02/2009 No appearance is required under the following conditions: This case is referred to Master Calendar for selection of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference dates. All counse...
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
December 02, 2008 | Tentative Ruling |
Good cause appearing, and the parties having stipulated thereto, plaintiffs Magers, Cochran, and Ko's motion to consolidate Magers v. Pavan, No. 34-2007-00881239 with Pavan v. Walmer, No. 07AM04185 fo...
Judge: James M. Mize |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.