Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David H Whittum, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Unlimited (02) case against City Council Of The City Of Sunnyvale, City Of Sunnyvale, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Unlimited (02) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = return to judgment directing issuance of premptory writ of mandate Legacy Name = CV Other |
|
October 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 10/11/2007 |
|
October 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Text = GRANTED re: peremptory writ of mandate is amended to extend the return date from 9/30/2007 to 3/31/2008, signed Judge Nichols. Legacy Name = CV Stip/Order Decision = G Closed = 10/09/2007 |
|
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Text = JUDGMENT GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE SIGNED BY JUDGE NICHOLS Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 08/09/2007 |
|
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Text = PEREMPTORY WIRT OF MANDATE SIGNED BY JUDGE NICHOLS Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 08/09/2007 |
|
June 19, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing: Writ
Judge: Department 21 |
|
June 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Text = ORDER RE: CEQA PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE , PETITIONER'S WRIT PETITION IS GRANTED. IN PART ON THE FOLLOWING GROUNDS. SIGNED BY JUDGE NICHOLS Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 06/19/2007 |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Brief: Reply Text = brief) David H. Whittum (pp) Legacy Name = CV Reply Brief Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2007 |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Text = for reply brief Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Express/Overnight Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2007 |
|
June 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Text = brief) filed by David H. Wittum (ppp) Legacy Name = CV Reply Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.