Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Catalina Gonzalez, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Terrell S. Root, against Guadalupe G. Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time799 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2009 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 19 |
|
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = by Atty Terrell S. Root Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/05/2009 |
|
January 15, 2009 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 19 |
|
November 06, 2008 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 19 |
|
August 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 19 |
|
May 06, 2008 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 19 |
|
February 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 19 |
|
November 20, 2007 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 8 |
|
August 09, 2007 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 8 |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Legacy Name = ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf Decision = M Closed = 06/01/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.