Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Agnes Claire Norman, filed a(n) Spousal Property - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategorySpousal Property Petition |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeSpousal Property |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2006 | Hearing | Petition: Spousal Property | |
February 23, 2006 | Hearing | Petition: Spousal Property | |
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Inventory and Appraisal Text = Final For The Total Amount Of $ 283,159.30 Legacy Name = PR Inventory & Appraisement Decision = M Closed = 02/22/2006 |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order: Appoint Probate Referee Legacy Name = PR Ord:Appt Probate Referee Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2006 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition: Probate Other (First) Text = w/ attach. $274.50 paid. Legacy Name = PR Petn:Spousal Property w/ntc Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2005 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Text = 2/23/06 -w/ proof Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.