Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cal Stuart Frenzel, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2005 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order: Final Discharge Legacy Name = PR Decl/Ord:Final Discharge Decision = G Closed = 03/26/2010 |
|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement Text = Of Receipt of Fnl Distr. by Cal Stuart Frenzel. Legacy Name = PR Acknowledgement Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2010 |
|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement Text = Of Receipt of fnl Distr. by Glen Edward Frenzel. Legacy Name = PR Acknowledgement Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2010 |
|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement Text = Of Receipt of Fnl Distr. by Steven Earl Frenzel. Legacy Name = PR Acknowledgement Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2010 |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = of receipt of dist by Cal Stuart Frenzel Legacy Name = PR Receipt of Distributee Decision = M Closed = 01/09/2009 |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = of receipt of dist by Glen Frenzel Legacy Name = PR Receipt of Distributee Decision = M Closed = 01/09/2009 |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = of receipt of dist by Steven Frenzel Legacy Name = PR Receipt of Distributee Decision = M Closed = 01/09/2009 |
|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Text = w/ proof Legacy Name = PR Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 11/26/2008 |
|
November 21, 2008 | Hearing | Hearing: Final Distribution | |
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order: Final Distribution Legacy Name = PR Ord:Final Distribution Decision = M Closed = 11/24/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.