Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Donna K.H. Beaumont, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Petition to Administer Estate Text = 01/26/06; w/proof of svc Legacy Name = PR Ntc:Petn to Administer Estate Decision = M Closed = 01/09/2006 |
|
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order: Final Discharge Text = Donna K. H. Beaumont - $40.00 paid Legacy Name = PR Decl/Ord:Final Discharge Decision = G Closed = 10/20/2006 |
|
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = by Donna Beaumont Legacy Name = PR Receipt of Distributee Decision = M Closed = 09/25/2006 |
|
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = by Nancy Balbiani Legacy Name = PR Receipt of Distributee Decision = M Closed = 09/25/2006 |
|
September 07, 2006 | Hearing | Hearing: Final Distribution | |
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order: Final Distribution Text = Settling First And Final Acct. And Report Of Admin. And Allowing Comp. Legacy Name = PR Ord:Final Distribution Decision = G Closed = 09/11/2006 |
|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion (Probate) Text = 09-07-06 w/service. Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg w/fee Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2006 |
|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Proposed Action/Objection/Consent Text = Consent by Alan David Hanashiro. Legacy Name = PR Ntc:Proposed Action/Obj/Consent Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2006 |
|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Proposed Action/Objection/Consent Text = Consent by Nancy Lee Balbiani Legacy Name = PR Ntc:Proposed Action/Obj/Consent Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2006 |
|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = 1st and fnl acct. and rpt of admin. and petn for its settlement, for allowance of compensation for ordinary services of attorney, and for fnl distr. Paid $40.00 Legacy Name = PR Petn:Final Distribution Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2006 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.