Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Public Guardian, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2005 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2010 | Hearing | Hearing: Report of Guardian/Trustee | |
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order: Approve Accounting Text = 2nd acct & report Legacy Name = PR Ord:Approve Acctng Decision = G Closed = 03/11/2010 |
|
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of clerical error re reduction of bond Legacy Name = PR Declaration Decision = M Closed = 03/10/2010 |
|
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of atty for fees and for reimbursement of costs Legacy Name = PR Declaration Decision = M Closed = 03/02/2010 |
|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (no fee) Text = 03/11/10 w/proof Legacy Name = PR Ntc of Hrg (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 02/09/2010 |
|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Accounting - Filed Text = 2nd acct & report $355pd Legacy Name = PR Acct/Rpt of Trustee Decision = M Closed = 02/09/2010 |
|
August 06, 2009 | Hearing | Reserved | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Text = w/proof of svc Legacy Name = PR Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2009 |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order: Approve Accounting Text = 1st acct & rpt of trustee & fees Legacy Name = PR Ord:Approve Acctng Decision = G Closed = 06/22/2009 |
|
March 27, 2009 | Hearing | Hearing: Report of Guardian/Trustee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.