Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mark S. Milz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gary B. Callahan, against Kassandra M. Baraceros, Santiago Baraceros, Thelma Baraceros, represented by Edgar W. Hawkyard, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time157 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Text = re: (Atty E. Hawkyard) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 06/06/2006 |
|
June 01, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 2 |
|
May 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = by Atty. Deacon Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 05/18/2006 |
|
May 09, 2006 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
April 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Text = by Atty E.S. Deacon. Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 04/17/2006 |
|
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2006 |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = atty hawkyard Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 02/09/2006 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = (Atty G. Callahan) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2005 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/30/2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.