Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ross-Green Valley Ii, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thomas Caudill, against Antone D. Bullock, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time131 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2006 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 2 |
|
April 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/o Prej Decision = M Closed = 04/03/2006 |
|
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/27/2006 |
|
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Text = basic default only Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 02/27/2006 |
|
February 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons w/Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 02/27/2006 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2005 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/29/2005 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.