Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Desert Palace, Inc., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by James A. Stearman, against Kenneth P. Rice, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
CategoryEnforcement Of Judgment Unlimited (20) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time475 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = santa clara, $66361.15 deficit, issued 10/24/06 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Partial Satis Decision = M Closed = 04/12/2007 |
|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction Legacy Name = CV Acknow/Satisf of Jgmt Full Decision = M Closed = 03/21/2007 |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice: Ruling Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Ruling Decision = M Closed = 12/18/2006 |
|
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order Text = ORDER FOR EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER AGAINST SPOUSE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLTF MOTION FOR AN EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDER AGAINST LYNNE C. RICE BE AND IT HEREBY IS GRANTED AND PLTF/JUDGMENT CREDITOR DESERT PALACE , INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION DBA CAESARS TAHOE IS ENTITLED TO FILE APPLICATIONS WITH THE LEVYING OFFICER OF ANY COUNTY TO WHICH A WRIT OF EXECUTION HAS BEEN ISSUED TO OBTAIN EARNINGS WITHHOLDING ORDERS AGAINST LYNNE C. RICE WHICH SHALL BE DIRECTED TO ANY OF HER EMPLOYERS AS APPLIED FOR BY PLAINTIFF. THIS ORDER IS BEING MADE TO CONFIRM THAT THE COMMUNITY PROPERTY INTERESTS OF DEFT/JUDGMENT DEBTOR KENNETH P. RICE AND HIS SPOUSE, LYNNE C. RICE ARE LIABLE FOR THE JUDGMENT IN THIS ACTION SIGNED BY JUDGE ELFVING Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 12/15/2006 |
|
December 14, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing: Motion hearings
Judge: Department 2 |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request: Telephonic Appearance Text = at motion for earnings withholding order against spouse of judgment debtor. 12-14-06 9:00am dept.2 James A. Stearman Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Intent/Appear by Phone Decision = M Closed = 11/07/2006 |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion: Other Text = for earnings withholding order against spouse of judgment debtor. 12-14-06 9:00am dept.2 James A. Stearman Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion w/fee Decision = M Closed = 11/07/2006 |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Issued) Text = 65,032.92 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 10/24/2006 |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = MAIL: 9/25/06 COSTS: 153.50 CREDIT: INTEREST: 4559.52 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 09/28/2006 |
|
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = SANTA CLARA Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 09/28/2006 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.