Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jennifer Thomas, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Bernadette Jackson, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2005 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2005 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV | |
September 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Text = POS for NTC of hearing and Temporatry restraining order; DEF served by Sheriff Legacy Name = CV Proof of Personal Svc Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2005 |
|
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment Text = Granted by Judge Huber/Faxed to Sheriff's. Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Hrg & TRO/Harassment Closed = 09/16/2005 |
|
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Request: Restraining Order Text = Waiver for court fees denied. Legacy Name = CV Req:Orders Stop Harass Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2005 |
|
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2005 |
|
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = Order for Cv Harassment. Legacy Name = CV Decl:Ntc upon ExParte Appl for Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2005 |
|
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Order-Grant Text = Denied in whole by Judge Huber. Legacy Name = CV Ord:Waiver of Costs/Fees Decision = D Closed = 08/31/2005 |
|
August 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Application Legacy Name = CV Appl:Waiver Court Fees/Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.