Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Joseph Voynshtok, Marina Mozgovaya, Janet Hutson, Laura Hutson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Patrick Michael O'Shaughnessy, against Janet Hutson, Laura Hutson, Marina Iva Mozgovaya, represented by Cary Steven Smith, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2005 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2007 | Hearing | Hearing: Dismissal after settlement | |
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = atty Amy Carlson Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 06/04/2007 |
|
May 29, 2007 | Hearing | Jury Trial: Long Cause | |
May 23, 2007 | Hearing | Conference: Settlement Jury | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Text = by atty Amy Carlson. Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 05/22/2007 |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Jury Fee Deposit Text = $150.00 paid Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 04/17/2007 |
|
January 09, 2007 | Hearing | Conference: Trial Setting | |
November 30, 2006 | Hearing | Review: Arbitration Order | |
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = as to small claims case (xcomplt) 8-5-05 (pro per) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 12/04/2006 |
|
November 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Rejection: Arbitration Award by Def Text = atty Patrick M. O'Shaugnessy// TSC set 1-9-07 Legacy Name = CV Reject Arb Award/Req Trial de Novo[D] Decision = M Closed = 11/27/2006 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.