Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jessee Brothers Machine Shop, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Aspect Systems, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time130 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2006 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 8 |
|
March 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default Text = Judgment by Clerk in favor of pltff Jessee Brothers Machine Shop Dba JB Precision for a total amount of $50,989.89 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = G Closed = 03/28/2006 |
|
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Text = As to Doe defts only. Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 03/28/2006 |
|
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Text = And appl for clerks jmnt on a dflt previously entered on 03-06-06 Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 03/28/2006 |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Default Not Entered Text = atty fees exceed schedule for open book acct. seek court jgmt. proposed jgmt rtnd. Legacy Name = CV Default Not Entered Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2006 |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Certif/Regist Mail Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2006 |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Text = basic default. Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2006 |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Default Not Entered Text = return receipt required on pos. Legacy Name = CV Default Not Entered Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2006 |
|
February 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = CV Summons Returned/No Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 03/01/2006 |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/05/2006 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.