Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bruce L. Williams, Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Stephen S. Fry, against Bruce L. Williams, Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg, represented by Michael Smith, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2001 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Declaration and order for jury fee refund Filed
Date: February 04, 2004Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: November 18, 2003Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: May 08, 2003Memo to Case Filed
Date: May 05, 2005Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: December 18, 2003Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: November 26, 2003First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 21, 2003Motion to Amend Granted
Date: November 18, 2003Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: November 18, 2003Memo to Case Jury Deposit Received from Defendant Filed
Date: November 04, 2003Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed
Date: November 04, 2003Proposed Order
Date: October 17, 2003Declaration in Support of Joseph D. Ryan
Date: October 17, 2003Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 17, 2003Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: August 05, 2003Motion to Amend Filed for Plaintiff
Date: October 17, 2003Proposed Order Stipulation and Order
Date: July 28, 2003Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Bruce L. Williams
Date: July 28, 2003Substitution of Attorney Filed for Bruce L. Williams
Date: June 09, 2003Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: May 08, 2003Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: May 07, 2003Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: May 06, 2003Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: May 05, 2003Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: May 02, 2003Miscellaneous Defendant's Offer to Compromise Filed
Date: May 02, 2003Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: April 25, 2003Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: April 11, 2003Settlement Conference Statement of Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg Filed
Date: April 09, 2003Memo to Case Filed
Date: April 07, 2003Settlement Conference Statement of Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg Filed
Date: April 07, 2003Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 24, 2002Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: October 24, 2002Case Management Statement of Bruce L. Williams Filed
Date: October 16, 2002Case Management Statement of Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg Filed
Date: October 09, 2002Notice of Order Rescheduling CMC Filed
Date: September 16, 2002Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: July 03, 2002Rejection of Arbitrator Filed for Plaintiff
Date: June 24, 2002Final Assignment of Arbitrator Filed
Date: June 24, 2002Notice of Proposed Arbitrators Filed
Date: June 14, 2002Notice Setting: Case Management Conference Filed
Date: June 13, 2002Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: June 13, 2002Case Management Statement of Marcy Nordberg Filed
Date: June 07, 2002Initial Case Management Conference 06/13/2002 08:45 AM D- 2
Date: April 11, 2002Case Management Statement of Bruce L. Williams Filed
Date: June 06, 2002Answer to Complaint Filed for Bruce L. Williams
Date: March 01, 2002Stipulation Re: Consolidate Cases Filed for Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg
Date: February 05, 2002Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 01, 2002Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed
Date: February 01, 2002Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marcy Nordberg
Date: December 03, 2001Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: July 30, 2003Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: February 01, 2002Stipulation Re: Consolidate Cases Granted
Date: March 22, 2002Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: December 03, 2001Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: January 09, 2004Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2002-02-01T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/13/2002 08:45 AM D- 2
Date: 2002-04-11T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Consolidate Cases Granted
Date: 2002-03-22T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: 2003-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2003-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2003-12-18T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg Filed
Date: 2003-04-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2003-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Proposed Arbitrators Filed
Date: 2002-06-14T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2003-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bruce L. Williams Filed
Date: 2002-06-06T00:00:00Notice Setting: Case Management Conference Filed
Date: 2002-06-13T00:00:00Memo to Case Filed
Date: May 05, 2005Motion to Amend Granted
Date: 2003-11-18T00:00:00Motion to Amend Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2003-10-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Bruce L. Williams
Date: 2003-07-28T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2003-04-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Marcy Nordberg Filed
Date: 2002-06-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2003-07-30T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Bruce L. Williams
Date: 2002-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service Proof of Service of Case Management Conference Orders and Order Setting Further Cas
Date: 2002-06-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marcy Nordberg
Date: 2001-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: 2002-07-03T00:00:00Complaint Fraud Filed
Date: 2001-12-03T00:00:00Final Assignment of Arbitrator Filed
Date: 2002-06-24T00:00:00Rejection of Arbitrator Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2002-06-24T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Consolidate Cases Filed for Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg
Date: 2002-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2002-06-13T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed
Date: 2002-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg Filed
Date: 2002-10-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous Defendant's Offer to Compromise Filed
Date: 2003-05-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bruce L. Williams Filed
Date: 2002-10-16T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2003-04-25T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: 2003-05-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Bruce L. Williams
Date: 2003-06-09T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: 2003-05-07T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: 2003-05-08T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: 2003-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2002-10-24T00:00:00Memo to Case Jury Deposit Received from Defendant Filed
Date: 2003-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2002-10-24T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Marcy Nordberg, Peter Nordberg Filed
Date: 2003-04-07T00:00:00Memo to Case Filed
Date: 2003-04-07T00:00:00Declaration and order for jury fee refund Filed
Date: February 04, 2004Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: January 09, 2004Notice of Order Rescheduling CMC Filed
Date: 2002-09-16T00:00:00Master Jury Trial Called and Continued
Date: 2003-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2003-08-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.