Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Raymond Alcide Patenaude, against Zamudio Silvia, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with William J. Monahan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2001 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Limited (35) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Renewal of Judgment Legacy Name = CV Ntc Returned/Renewal of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 07/12/2012 |
|
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Decision = M Closed = 07/12/2012 |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = interest $2057.67; mail, 5-11-12 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2012 |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Application: Renewal Judgment Text = $4158.39 Legacy Name = CV Appl for Renewal of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2012 |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Renewal of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2012 |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2012 |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = santa clara 04/15/09 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 03/14/2012 |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Issued) Text = atty Patenaude Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 04/15/2009 |
|
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = Interest $1,418.16 POS by mail on 3/30/09. Atty Patenaude Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 04/15/2009 |
|
June 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = Document Filed -- Judgment by Default by Court. Operator: CST Fee: $0.00 Party Name: Capital One Bank Party Name: Silvia Zamudio Damages, Fees, Interest And Costs: Damages: $1,526.72, Attorney Fees: $405.00, Interest: $0.00 Costs: $139.00, Total Costs: $2,070.72 By Judge: Gregory H. Ward Decision = M Closed = 06/06/2002 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.