Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Primus Financial Services, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Todd Alfred Macdowell, against Blackburn Jeffery M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Diane Ritchie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiane Ritchie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2001 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Limited (35) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction Legacy Name = CV Acknow/Satisf of Jgmt Full Decision = M Closed = 05/14/2013 |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) Text = Los Angeles Co. $2092.88 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 05/31/2012 |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice: Renewal of Judgment Legacy Name = CV Ntc Returned/Renewal of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 05/31/2012 |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Renewal of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/20/2011 |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = acknowledgment of credit $1,100.00 accrued interest $991.87 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 06/20/2011 |
|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application: Renewal Judgment Text = FOR A TOTAL AMT OF $2,067.88 Legacy Name = CV Appl for Renewal of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 06/20/2011 |
|
September 05, 2002 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
September 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Dismissal Review; Judgment Entered Heard By: Judge N. Cabrinha Department 10 Decision = M Closed = 04/25/2002 |
|
September 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: , Time: 10:00, Dept: 10, Operator: RTN Bail: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Decision = M Closed = 09/05/2002 |
|
May 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued Text = Document Issued -- Abstract of Judgment. Operator: AJV Fee: $7.00 Decision = M Closed = 05/22/2002 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.