Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jennifer M Lopez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gerren C Power, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Gregory H. Saldivar presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2001 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bulk Scanned Documents 10/15/12 to 4/14/2014 |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bulk Scanned Documents 1/03/05 to 9/25/12 Volume 2 |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Bulk Scanned Documents 6/22/01 to 12/08/04 Volume 1 |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Text = findings and oah Legacy Name = FL Order After Hrg Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2014 |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Text = mailed third page and order on appl to be relieved filed on 030414 (r)(p) Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 04/04/2014 |
|
March 04, 2014 | Hearing |
OSC: Contempt
Judge: Department 95 |
|
March 04, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing: Other
Judge: Department 95 |
|
March 04, 2014 | Hearing |
OSC: Contempt Orders Issued |
|
March 04, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing: Other Orders Issued |
|
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice: Limited Scope Representation Text = relieved as atty Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Ltd Scope of Representation Decision = M Closed = 03/05/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.