Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maria C Canales, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2001 |
CategoryDissolution Summary Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = Ntc: Entry of Jgmt & Cert. of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 01/02/2002 |
|
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Summary Dissolution Legacy Name = Jgmt of Dissolution - Joint Petition Decision = M Closed = 01/02/2002 |
|
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
FC 2336 Packet Received for Review Legacy Name = 2336 Packet Decision = M Closed = 12/06/2001 |
|
March 29, 2001 | Docket Event |
Petition: Summary Dissolution Legacy Name = Joint Petition for Summary Dissolution Decision = M Closed = 03/29/2001 |
|
March 29, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.