Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maren Lassner, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Christopher Keeling, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2001 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2001 | Hearing |
Request for Order: Domestic Violence
Judge: Department 73 |
|
June 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order: Restraining Order After Hearing Text = cf 6/26/01 Legacy Name = Restraining Order After Hrg [CLETS] Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2001 |
|
June 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Text = osc and temporary restraining order (DV) Legacy Name = Proof of Personal Service [CPHR] Decision = M Closed = 06/18/2001 |
|
June 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
CLETS Restraining Order Text = cf 6/05/01 Legacy Name = Temp Restraining Order: TRO [CLETS] Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2001 |
|
June 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Request: Domestic Violence Restraining Order Legacy Name = OSC/RO Domestic Violence [CLETS] Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2001 |
|
June 04, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.