Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by District Attorney - Santa Clara, against Sergio P. Monzon, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
July 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS Text = (otp) Legacy Name = Ntc: Entry/Jgmt with Proof of Service Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2002 |
|
July 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS Text = (r) Legacy Name = Ntc: Entry/Jgmt with Proof of Service Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2002 |
|
June 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Text = in support of final judgment re parental obligation Legacy Name = Affidavit Decision = M Closed = 06/20/2002 |
|
June 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Other DA Support/Default Legacy Name = Jgmt (Other DA Support) by Default Decision = M Closed = 06/20/2002 |
|
June 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default Judgment/Uncontested Legacy Name = Decl: Default/Uncontested Jgmt [DA] Decision = M Closed = 06/20/2002 |
|
June 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Application and Order: Health Insurance Coverage Legacy Name = Appl & Order for Health Ins Coverage Decision = M Closed = 06/20/2002 |
|
June 17, 2002 | Docket Event |
Request: Entry of Default/CS Legacy Name = Request for Entry of Default [DA] Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2002 |
|
May 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Legacy Name = Proof of Personal Service Decision = M Closed = 05/09/2002 |
|
January 09, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = Proof of Service by Mail [CPHR] Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2002 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.