Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by District Attorney - Santa Clara, against John A Hurst, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
September 24, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS Legacy Name = Ntc: Entry/Jgmt with Proof of Service Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2003 |
|
August 26, 2003 | Docket Event |
Stipulated Judgment Legacy Name = Stip: Entry of Jgmt and Jgmt [DA] Decision = M Closed = 08/26/2003 |
|
July 11, 2003 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Text = (d) Legacy Name = Proof of Service/Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2003 |
|
January 02, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = Proof of Service by Mail [CPHR] Decision = M Closed = 01/02/2002 |
|
December 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint DCSS Legacy Name = Govt Compl/Est Parental Rel/Support Decision = M Closed = 12/13/2001 |
|
December 13, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.