Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2001 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2021 |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
March 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
June 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Text = (d; otp) Legacy Name = Ntc/Entry of Dism/Proof of Service [DA] Decision = M Closed = 06/10/2004 |
|
April 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice Legacy Name = Request for Dismissal/Entire/WO Prej Decision = M Closed = 04/26/2004 |
|
December 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = Proof of Service by Mail [CPHR] Decision = M Closed = 12/12/2001 |
|
December 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint DCSS Legacy Name = Govt Compl/Est Parental Rel/Support Decision = M Closed = 12/05/2001 |
|
December 05, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.