Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by District Attorney - Santa Clara, against Grant White, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Gregory H. Saldivar presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory H. Saldivar Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
June 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Text = oah (otp)(r) Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2006 |
|
June 26, 2006 | Hearing | Hearing: Motion hearings | |
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing Legacy Name = FL Order After Hrg Decision = M Closed = 06/27/2006 |
|
February 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion (Family) Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Mtn/DA Closed = 06/29/2006 |
|
August 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS Text = def and otp served judgment Legacy Name = Ntc: Entry/Jgmt with Proof of Service Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2002 |
|
July 22, 2002 | Hearing | Motion: Judgment Temp Ch Supp/Health | |
July 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
Other Text = advisement of rights Legacy Name = Other [FL/DA/CP/DV]... Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2002 |
|
July 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Estab Parent Relat/Supt Legacy Name = Jgmt Est Parental Relationship/Supp [DA] Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2002 |
|
May 15, 2002 | Hearing | Motion: Judgment Temp Ch Supp/Health |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.