Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by District Attorney - Santa Clara, against Ramon Duarte, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
March 27, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) Legacy Name = Notice of Entry of Judgment Decision = M Closed = 03/27/2002 |
|
March 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Legacy Name = Proof of Personal Service Decision = M Closed = 03/14/2002 |
|
March 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
Stipulated Judgment Legacy Name = Stip: Entry of Jgmt and Jgmt [DA] Decision = M Closed = 03/06/2002 |
|
February 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = Proof of Service by Mail [CPHR] Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2002 |
|
December 11, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 11, 2001 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint DCSS Legacy Name = Govt Compl/Est Parental Rel/Support Decision = M Closed = 12/11/2001 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.