Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Central Park Associates, A California General Partnership, filed a(n) Civil case against Paula M. Daigle, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Fremont Hall of Justice.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2000 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseFremont Hall of Justice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2006 | Hearing |
FTC w/ Local Rules - Complaint
Judge: Thomas J. Nixon |
|
February 10, 2006 | Document_Filed | Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed | |
February 10, 2006 | Document_Filed | Civil OSC Commenced and Completed | |
November 04, 2005 | Document_Filed | Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed | |
October 27, 2005 | Document_Filed | Civil OSC 02/10/2006 10:30 AM D- 604 | |
March 17, 2000 | Document_Filed | Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued | |
March 17, 2000 | Action | Summons on Complaint Issued | |
March 17, 2000 | Document_Filed | Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.