Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Edgewater Holding Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Logan, William A., Jr, against Does 1-30, Inclusive, Lu, Qingqing, Ye, Xiaozheng, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
51947Stipu000eb0
Date: January 13, 2022ADR-CV-1 Form Signed by all parties 01132022
Date: January 13, 202251978Amend00723a
Date: January 13, 2022Amended ADR-CV-1
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Entry of Order
Date: January 27, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 02, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 02, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: September 22, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 02, 2021Order
Date: December 06, 2021Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 28, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 23, 2020Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: April 21, 2021Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: April 21, 2021CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: April 08, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 13, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: July 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 06, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 21, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 14, 2021Request to Enter Default
Date: May 25, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: January 20, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 07, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: August 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 30, 2021Motion to Vacate
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 01, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 21, 2021ADR Referral
Date: December 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 22, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: January 13, 2022Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: January 13, 20222022_0405 Request for Dismissal
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal
Date: April 06, 2022Answer
Date: December 08, 2021Order
Date: August 31, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 28, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash
Date: June 29, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 28, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 28, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 28, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 28, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 16, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 02, 2021Notice
Date: August 12, 2021Complaint
Date: December 23, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022_0405 Request for Dismissal | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended ADR-CV-1 | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 51947Stipu000eb0 | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR-CV-1 Form Signed by all parties 01132022 | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | 51978Amend00723a |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.