Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
American Express National Bank, Successor By Merger To American Express Bank,Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mikhalevich, Marianna, Slinsky, Lourdes R., against Does 1 To 20, Spasic, Marta J, The French Patisserie Inc. A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Halperin, Ernst presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Complaint
Date: December 17, 202020160370_FULLY EXECUTED SOA WITH POS
Date: September 14, 202220160370_DISMISSAL WITH PREJ
Date: May 10, 2023Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: January 08, 2021Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: January 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | 20160370_DISMISSAL WITH PREJ | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 20160370_FULLY EXECUTED SOA WITH POS | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES, PCNew Attorney: LOURDES R SLI Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES, PC New Attorney: LOURDES R SLINSKY |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - SERVED MARIA Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - SERVED MARIA SPASIC- REGISTERED AGENT FOR SERVICE |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.