Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mora, Stephanie Salas, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Jalil-Valles, Shahla, against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Foundas Investments Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Halperin, Ernst presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
Category(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Stephanie Salas Mora against Foundas Investments Inc., also known as The Blue Door, and other individuals. The complaint alleges multiple violations, including sex harassment, race/national origin discrimin...
Complaint
Date: December 15, 2020Request For Dismissal
Date: January 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 4/21/21 |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.