Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Shari Roseman Individually An On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited Class Action case represented by Lurie, Jordan L., against Facebook, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Swope, V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited Class Action |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges violations of California Business and Professions Code Section 17200, et seq., and unjust enrichment by Facebook, Inc. The plaintiff, Shari Rosenman, claims that Facebook has engaged in illegal practices that harm consumer priv...
Amended Complaint
Date: January 12, 2021Complaint
Date: December 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Removal to Federal Court | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Amended Complaint FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Class Action Complex Notice | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.