Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Montufar, Edgar, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Sampson, Benjamin A., against Does 1 Through 35; Inclusive, Fernandez, Librado, Lee'S Gardening Service, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Finigan, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2020 |
Category(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: January 18, 2024Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Deposition
Date: February 25, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: August 02, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 10, 2022Motion to Compel Depositions
Date: June 17, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: February 25, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: December 16, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: September 09, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: July 18, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 06, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: April 08, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: December 28, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: May 11, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: October 18, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 07, 2021Complaint
Date: December 09, 2020Request For Dismissal
Date: November 27, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: May 11, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: May 11, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: October 17, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 05, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 06, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 01, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: March 01, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: February 25, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 22, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 16, 2021TRIAL SETTING STATEMENT
Date: October 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 15, 2021Notice
Date: November 22, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 16, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: April 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 08, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: April 21, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 09, 2020Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
Date: February 05, 2021ADR Referral
Date: April 08, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 10, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: January 21, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 09, 2020Plaintiff's Reply _Motion to Compel Deposition
Date: June 10, 202259829CaseM00df01
Date: July 01, 2022Case Mgnt-Trial Setting Stmt (7.18.22)
Date: July 05, 2022RFD
Date: November 27, 202364259CaseM001ab2
Date: September 30, 2022Case Mgnt-Trial Setting Stmt 10.17.2022
Date: October 05, 2022Notice of Sett
Date: August 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Entire Action | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal 4/29/2024 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal 4/29/2024 at 9:00 a.m. |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice, ONLY CAUSES OF ACTION NO.'S 7-12 OF COMPLAINT Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice, ONLY CAUSES OF ACTION NO.'S 7-12 OF COMPLAINT |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Failure to Timely File Dismissal after Settlement | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RFD | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Time estimate- 10 days Judge: Finigan, Jeffrey R. |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Finigan, Jeffrey R. |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.