Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bay City Mechanical, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hsueh, Michael Y, against Bmr-1000 Gateway Lp, Does 1 To 25, Inclusive, Turner Construction Company, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Amended Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 10, 2020First Amended Complaint
Date: December 10, 2020Complaint
Date: December 03, 2020Request For Dismissal
Date: March 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice - ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice - ENTIRE ACTION |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SERVED TO DENSISE LUKE-ADMIN. SERVICESSUMMONS, CIVIL CASE C Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SERVED TO DENSISE LUKE-ADMIN. SERVICES SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CMC |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Summons Issued / Filed ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Summons Issued / Filed ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | First Amended Complaint | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.