Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Peralta, Andrea, Peralta, Benjamin, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Davis, Jonathan E., against Cbre, Inc., Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Eurest Services, Inc., represented by Glendon, Sarah F., Vieux, Steve, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Halperin, Ernst presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
Category(35) Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Andrea Peralta and Benjamin Peralta, represented by the Arns Law Firm. The complaint is against CBRE Group, Eurest Services, Inc., and fictitious defendants Does 1 to 100. The complaint alleges personal inj...
10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: June 29, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 01, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 18, 2021CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.
Date: April 01, 2021Order Denying
Date: August 12, 2021Complaint
Date: December 01, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 29, 202110 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: August 17, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: November 15, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: October 14, 202155158STIPU00b036
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.Signed
Date: May 20, 2022Request_for_Dismissal_Peralta_Signed
Date: June 16, 2022Declaration
Date: January 15, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 01, 2020Order
Date: March 24, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 01, 2020Advanced Jury Fee Plaintiff Non-Refundable
Date: April 12, 2021ADR Referral
Date: June 04, 2021Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: July 22, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: August 16, 2021Request For Dismissal
Date: June 16, 2022Stipulation
Date: March 22, 2022Statement of Non-Agreement
Date: March 02, 202210 Day Reminder Notice to Complete the ADR Process
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: March 19, 2021Notice
Date: June 16, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: December 17, 2020Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Hearing re
Date: October 15, 2021CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip
Date: September 02, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR
Date: October 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Request_for_Dismissal_Peralta_Signed | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT |
|
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.Signed | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Type: TO EXTEND THE ADR COMPLIANCE DEADLINESigned by: COMMISSIONER HALPERINDate Signed: 03/2 Order Type: TO EXTEND THE ADR COMPLIANCE DEADLINE Signed by: COMMISSIONER HALPERIN Date Signed: 03/23/2022 |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
2nd Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance Until 06/01/22 per Order filed 3/24/22. |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | 55158STIPU00b036 | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation REQUESTING TO EXTEND THE ADR COMPLIANCE DEADLINE Stipulation REQUESTING TO EXTEND THE ADR COMPLIANCE DEADLINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.