Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chowdhry, Humza Shahid, The Chowdhry, Corp., Itria Ventures Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Takenouchi, Jason S., against Chowdhry, Humza Shahid, Does 1- 50, Inclusive, Hc Design And Construction Inc., The Chowdhry, Corp., represented by Verbiscar-Brown, Nathan, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2020 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: February 19, 2021Cross Complaint
Date: February 10, 2021Request For Dismissal
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: March 01, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 06, 2020Demurrer to Complaint
Date: November 06, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 21, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 06, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: January 13, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: January 13, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 21, 2021Answer
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 11, 2020Complaint
Date: September 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Discovery Conference *Informal Discovery Conference Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice - ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice - ENTIRE ACTION |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Cross Complaint | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.