Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Kidwell, Christopher, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Roach, John J., against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Evans, Sally, represented by Casey, Arthur J., Jungwirth, Daniel J, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Greenberg, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2020 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case. The plaintiff, Christopher Kidwell, is suing the defendant, Sally Evans, and other unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants, whic...
DEF AMENDED Satisfaction of Judgment 01.09.24
Date: January 19, 2024StipandOrdertoADRsignedbyallparties
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 04, 2020Summons Issued / Filed
Date: August 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 01, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: October 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2021Complaint
Date: August 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 10, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 11, 2020CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.
Date: December 02, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 04, 2020ADR Referral
Date: September 28, 202110 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 17, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: January 21, 2022CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip
Date: January 12, 2022StatementofNonagreement
Date: March 12, 2022DEF Acknowledgment of Judgment (FULL) 01.10.24
Date: January 11, 2024CMC_STATEMENT_final Kidwell
Date: May 18, 2022Joint CMC Statement Kidwell
Date: June 13, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: May 25, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 25, 202210 Day Reminder Notice to Complete the ADR Process
Date: February 18, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 13, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 18, 2022Statement of Non-Agreement
Date: March 14, 2022CMC_Statement final Kidwell
Date: June 21, 2022DEF Acknowledgment of Judgment(FULL) 01.09.24
Date: January 11, 2024DEF Order RE Tax Costs 01.02.24
Date: January 02, 2024DEF Amended Judgment 01.02.24
Date: January 02, 2024DEF Reply to Opposition 12.12.23
Date: December 12, 2023Declaration of John J. Roach
Date: December 04, 2023Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs
Date: December 04, 2023Proposed Order
Date: July 20, 2022Proposed Order Cover Sheet
Date: July 20, 202220220808_Notice_of_Change_of_Address
Date: August 08, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 21, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 29, 2022PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: August 08, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: July 20, 2022def Proposed__MILs
Date: July 19, 2023Plaintiff Pretrial Conference Statement
Date: July 19, 2023MIL 3 to Previous Injuries and Claims
Date: July 17, 2023MIL 1 Exclude Evidence of Waived Claims
Date: July 17, 2023MIL 2 Exclude Evidence of Medical Records
Date: July 17, 2023def Proposed__Jury_Instructions
Date: July 19, 2023def Proposed__Verdict_Form
Date: July 19, 2023def Proposed__Witness_List
Date: July 19, 2023DEF Stipulation to Cont PTC 07.20.23
Date: July 20, 2023DEF Proposed Statement of Case 07.20.23
Date: July 21, 2023deff Proposed__EXHIBIT_LIST
Date: July 20, 2023DEF Joint Jury Instructions 07.20.23
Date: July 21, 2023DEF Pretrial Conference Statement 07.20.23
Date: July 21, 2023DEF Joint Witness List 07.20.23
Date: July 21, 2023DEF Proposed Verdict Form 07.20.23
Date: July 21, 2023DEF Joint Exhibit List 07.20.23
Date: July 21, 2023Motion In Limine
Date: July 17, 2023Motion In Limine
Date: July 17, 2023Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: July 20, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: August 11, 2022Motion In Limine
Date: July 17, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 29, 2022Proposed Verdict
Date: July 19, 2023Motion In Limine
Date: July 19, 2023Proposed Verdict
Date: July 20, 2023Order
Date: August 11, 2022DEF OPP TO PL MIL 3
Date: August 04, 2023DEF Proposed Order (RE MILS 1-11) 08.08.23
Date: August 08, 2023Notice of Plaintiff Deposition Designations
Date: August 11, 2023Stipulation & Order
Date: July 24, 2023Pretrial Conference
Date: August 09, 2023Affidavit of Electronic Service
Date: August 08, 2023Motion In Limine
Date: August 08, 2023Pretrial Order
Date: August 08, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 04, 2023Motion in Limine to Preclude Oshtory
Date: August 18, 2023Declaration of Chuck Geerhart
Date: August 18, 2023Local Form CV-69 - Request for an Offic..
Date: August 18, 2023DEF Demonstrative Defense Brief 08.25.23
Date: August 25, 2023DEF Motion for Mistrial 08.25.23
Date: August 25, 20232nd Updated Stipulated Exhibit List 08.31.23
Date: September 01, 2023Amended Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: October 23, 2023DEF Motion to Tax Costs 10.25.23
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | DEF AMENDED Satisfaction of Judgment 01.09.24 | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | DEF Acknowledgment of Judgment (FULL) 01.10.24 | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | DEF Acknowledgment of Judgment(FULL) 01.09.24 | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | DEF Order RE Tax Costs 01.02.24 | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | DEF Amended Judgment 01.02.24 | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DEF Reply to Opposition 12.12.23 | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of John J. Roach | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | DEF Motion to Tax Costs 10.25.23 | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Memorandum of Costs (Summary) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.