Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bolbolan, Shayan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Genardini, Mike, On Track Automotive Repair, represented by Kallis, Alexander M., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 23, 2020 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo. The case number is not provided. The plaintiff is listed as "I" and the defendant is listed as "6k€7n." The complaint is related to a contract dispute....
93067Answe0068be
Date: March 01, 202492646Proof0131c1
Date: February 26, 202492646Answe004e02
Date: February 26, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: June 08, 2021Complaint
Date: July 23, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 16, 202170040Subst00a85d
Date: January 30, 2023Summons Issued / Filed
Date: July 23, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 23, 2020CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: February 18, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: August 25, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 07, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 07, 2021Order
Date: October 04, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: January 11, 2022Order
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: August 30, 2022Pretrial hearing
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: September 29, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 07, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: January 31, 2022CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.
Date: November 20, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 07, 2021Joint Case Management Statement
Date: January 04, 2022Notice of Court Trial
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: January 11, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: October 04, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: August 10, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 11, 2022Order
Date: September 26, 2022Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: January 19, 202371859Proof02edc1
Date: March 04, 202371859Witne002bd1
Date: March 04, 202371859Exhib017bf9
Date: March 04, 202372342Trial00d5ff
Date: March 14, 202372342Proof0120f7
Date: March 14, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 23, 2020Declaration
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: October 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 93067Answe0068be | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | 92646Proof0131c1 | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | 92646Answe004e02 | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 72342Trial00d5ff | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 72342Proof0120f7 | |
March 04, 2023 | Docket Event | 71859Proof02edc1 | |
March 04, 2023 | Docket Event | 71859Witne002bd1 | |
March 04, 2023 | Docket Event | 71859Exhib017bf9 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | 70040Subst00a85d | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 1/31/2023 at 9:30 AM Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 1/31/2023 at 9:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.